This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/02/2020 at 16:23:44 (UTC).

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY,ELONZO THOMAS VS DANIEL LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY,ELONZO THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL LOPEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6538

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elonzo Thomas

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Defendant

Daniel Lopez

Houston, TX 77016-2500

Not Classified By Court

DENISE E HEWITT PETERSON

Houston, TX 77065

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAMS, DACIA A

Attorney at Susan L Florence & Associates

811 Louisiana St Ste 2400

Houston, TX 77002

HARDWICKE, KELLY DIANE

1201 Elm St Suite 5050

Dallas, TX 75270

 

Court Documents

BRA Notice_0541714630.1.pdf

Notice: Of Filing Affidavit Of Vicki Bailess-Cowan

180 Design Lead Aty 0541714630.1.pdf

Designation of Attorney

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service: Return of Service

Answer

Answer

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: MAIL TO ABC

0541714630.1 pet.pdf

eFile Original Petition

0541714630.1 let.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Of Filing Affidavit Of Vicki Bailess-Cowan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: MAIL TO ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less