This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/17/2017 at 17:21:33 (UTC).

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. WENDELL STEEN

Case Summary

On 02/04/2016 ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WENDELL STEEN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3264

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THERESA CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

HAMID NASERI

Defendants

VINICIO GARICA

WENDELL STEEN

KYLE MCGILBERRY

Not Classified By Court

David B Harberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KABELE, CHARLES

Attorney at SUSAN L. FLORENCE & ASSOCIATES

440 Louisiana St, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

CAVANAGH, JONATHAN D

420 Lockhaven Dr #100

Houston, TX 77073

 

Court Documents

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 2-23-16 APPEARANCE DATE 3-21-16 Film code number CCCL-2016-96356

(Proposed) Order of Dismissal with Prejudice.pdf

Proposed Order: of dismissal

Letter

Letter

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Crt 2-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 2-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Notice of Non-Suit (non-suit signed 2/23/17)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketReactivated Case (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: of dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketMotion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPartial Order to Dismiss and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS WENDELL STEEN AND KYLE MCGILBERRY ONLY ORDER NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketConversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketConversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketAttorney Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketE-Filing Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketRECEIVABLE GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Initiation Event (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAVANAGH, JONATHAN D