This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 16:01:01 (UTC).

ALLIED TRUST INSURANCE CO. VS WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION,SLB CORP.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 ALLIED TRUST INSURANCE CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION,SLB CORP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3810

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allied Trust Insurance Co.

Defendants

Whirlpool Corporation

C/O Corporation Service Company, 211 E. 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

SLB Corp.

C/O Matthew B. Veldman, 1906 E. Mckinley Ave

Mishawaka, IN 46545

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS, JASON EDMOND

Attorney at THE FUSSELMAN LAW FIRM, P.C.

1616 South Voss Rd., Ste. 775

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

Cvr Ltr.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Whirlpool Corporation Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

1448352 Req Cit.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Original Petition Non Resident Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

1183810.pdf

Affidavit of Service

1183810 Matthew Veldman.pdf

Return of Service

Affidavit and supports.pdf

Affidavit of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Trust Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SLB CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY DBA HOSE ASSEMBLIES is a litigant

Latest cases where WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS, JASON EDMOND