This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/06/2020 at 15:31:24 (UTC).

ALDINE APARTMENTS, LLC VS ROBERT WARE,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 ALDINE APARTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROBERT WARE,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6671

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aldine Apartments, LLC

C/O Cheryl Guest 12335 Kingsride Lane #141

Houston, TX 77024

Defendants

Robert Ware

Houston, TX 77039

All Other Occupants

Houston, TX 77039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POYNTER, MICHAEL

7660 Woodway Dr Suite 585

Houston, TX 77063

 

Court Documents

JP Citation

JP Citation

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY ROBERT WARE

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court: Marisol Garcia

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Nonsuit 1146671 12.18.2019.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: without Prejudice

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Index

JP Index

Nonsuit 1146671 12.18.2019.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Non-Suit: without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Index

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter from Justice of the Peace Court: Marisol Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY ROBERT WARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.