This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/27/2022 at 21:23:59 (UTC).

AIRGAS USA, LLC VS ELMER ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 AIRGAS USA, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELMER ALVARADO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRYEA AYALA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9634

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIRYEA AYALA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Airgas USA, LLC

Defendant

Elmer Alvarado

Houston, TX 77045

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Price, Stephen E.

Attorney at Freedman & Price, P.C.

1102 West Avenue, Suite 200

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Petition Alvarado.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Harris County Civil Courts.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: See Letter

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

Transmittal.pdf

Rule 106 Citation to be Issued

Motion for Substituted Service.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

Order.pdf

Proposed Order

Order for 106 - to Judge

Order for Rule 106

Rule 106 Citation

Rule 106 Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

executed 106 citation.pdf

Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 106 Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 106 Citation to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: See Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIRGAS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICE, STEPHEN E