Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 14:44:52 (UTC).

AHMER WALI ET AL. VS. LEOPOLDO HERNANDEZ-ARELLANO ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2014 AHMER WALI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEOPOLDO HERNANDEZ-ARELLANO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLYDE LEUCHTAG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8242

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CLYDE LEUCHTAG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALI GOUHER

Houston, TX 77063

WALI AHMER

Houston, TX 77063

GOUHER WALI

AHMER WALI

Defendants

SANTANA GONZALO

Houston, TX 77065

HERNANDEZ-ARELLANO LEOPOLDO

Brownsville, TX 78526

GONZALO SANTANA

Houston, TX 77065

LEOPOLDO HERNANDEZ-ARELLANO

Brownsville, TX 78526

Not Classified By Court

Timothy A Fjeldal

Houston,, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WALI GOUHER

Attorney at THE GARNER LAW FIRM

7660 Woodway Dr Ste 390

Houston, TX 77063

WOJCIAK ANDREW A

Attorney at THE GARNER LAW FIRM

7660 Woodway Dr Ste 390

Houston, TX 77063

WALI AHMER

Attorney at THE GARNER LAW FIRM

7660 Woodway Dr Ste 390

Houston, TX 77063

Garner, Stephen E

Attorney at THE GARNER LAW FIRM

7660 Woodway Dr Suite 390

Houston, TX 77063

Defendant Attorney

EPO, JAMES F.

7211 Regency Square Blvd., Suite 105

Houston, TX 77036

 

Court Documents

Crt 1-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance: AGREED Film code number CCCL-2014-401463

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance: AGREED Film code number CCCL-2015-163336

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

Crt 1-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-406308

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-406308

Original Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued

Original Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued

Crt 1-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 1-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 1-Parties Receiving Mediation Notice

Crt 1-Parties Receiving Mediation Notice

Order Not Entered

Order Not Entered: AGREED ORDER Film code number CCCL-2014-401465

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Partial Non-Suited and Notice: PARTIAL AS TO HERNANDEZ ONLY Film code number CCCL-2015-163836

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Partial Non-Suited and Notice: PARTIAL AS TO HERNANDEZ ONLY Film code number CCCL-2015-163836

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF DENNIS ALSTON Film code number CCCL-2015-199441

Order Not Entered

Order Not Entered: AGREED ORDER Film code number CCCL-2015-237175

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-406308

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-406308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: FOR JUDGMENT BASED ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-391666

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing: PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR JJUDGMENT BASED ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - DECEMBER 1, 2015 Film code number CCCL-2015-389457

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BASED ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT & JUDGMENT, NOTICE OF ORAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Rule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: RULE 11 AGREEMENT LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 1-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 1-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less