Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/11/2021 at 14:33:35 (UTC).

AHERN RENTALS, INC.,AHERN RENTALS, INC. VS MBS'S ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR, LLC,BLANCA WATSON

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 AHERN RENTALS, INC ,AHERN RENTALS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MBS'S ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR, LLC,BLANCA WATSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7173

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahern Rentals, Inc.

901 Main Street Suite 610

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendants

MBS'S Electrical Contractor, LLC

C/O Blanca Watson 12010 Sagedowne Ln

Houston, TX 77089

Blanca Watson

Houston, TX 77089

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROHE, JOSH

Attorney at STUBER COOPER VOGE

901 Main Street, Suite 610

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

L CC re Request for Citation - Ahern-MBS.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Blanca Watson Records Request Letter.pdf

Letter: to Citation Clerk - specifing def. to be served

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

2021 04 07 - Ahern Original Petition - MBS.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Ahern v MBS'S Civil Case Info Sheet.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Request for Citation

Citation to Be Issued: **OWES ISSUANCE AND COPY FEE**

Citation Request

Citation to Be Issued: **OWES ISSUANCE AND COPY FEE**

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: to Citation Clerk - specifing def. to be served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: SEE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ahern Rentals, Inc. is a litigant