Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 01:51:20 (UTC).

AGRAHARKAR ASSOCIATES, LLC VS HELEN RHODES, MD

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 AGRAHARKAR ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HELEN RHODES, MD. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4725

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Agraharkar Associates, LLC

Defendant

Helen Rhodes, MD

Webster, TX 77598

Counter Plaintiff

Helen Rhodes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WUENSCHE, MONTERE R.

P.O. Box 886

Tomball, TX 77377

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

SIMMONS, RICHARD ALLEN

Attorney at WALDRON & SCHNEIDER LLP

15150 Middlebrook Drive

Houston, TX 77058

 

Court Documents

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Nonsuit ORDER--Sent to Judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Agraharkar - Rhodes - Nonsuit.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Joint Notice of Nonsuit

Agraharkar - Rhodes - Nonsuit ORDER.pdf

Proposed Order: Order of Nonsuit

Agraharkar Associates, LLC - Original Answer.pdf

Answer

Agraharkar-PetvsRhod.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Original Petition ***OWES COPY AND ISSUANCE FEES***

Original Answer Counterclaim_FINAL.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer (Counter Claim not Paid)

Original Answer Counterclaim_FINAL.pdf

Counter Claim: Defendant's Original Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Joint Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounter Claim: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer (Counter Claim not Paid)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Original Petition ***OWES COPY AND ISSUANCE FEES***

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Simmons, Richard A