This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/12/2021 at 15:47:36 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE METAL PRODUCTS LLC VS GAS EMPIRE LLC

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 ABSOLUTE METAL PRODUCTS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GAS EMPIRE LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4324

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE METAL PRODUCTS LLC

Defendant

GAS EMPIRE LLC

5509 State Highway 185

Victoria, TX 77904

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Totz, Jon D.

Attorney at Totz, Ellison & Totz, P.C.

2211 Norfolk, Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

TOTZ, JON D

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk, Suite #510

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

101719 Clerk letter.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

101719 Case Info Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

101719 Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

Default Judgment (submitted)

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment

Proposed Order: Proposed Judgment

101719-SERVICE RETURN_SERVED (GAS EMPIRE).pdf

Return of Service

Writ of Execution

Execution Issued: 701

101719-execution request.pdf

Writ of Execution to be Issued

Abstract

Abstract Issued

101719-abstract req.pdf

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued

Execution Returned

Execution Returned: UNEXECUTED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExecution Returned: UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExecution Issued: 701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAS EMPIRE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTZ, JON D