This case was last updated from Fort Bend Justice Courts on 03/16/2023 at 08:03:57 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Victoria Medina

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Victoria Medina. This case was filed in Fort Bend Justice Courts, Fort Bend County Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Fort Bend, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0602

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fort Bend, Texas

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Medina, Victoria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Jamila B Lloyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMotion (No Fee); Motion for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketProposed Judgment/Order; Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAffidavit; Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Citation Service; Medina, Victoria; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; State Credit: (21.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; E-filing; Receipt # 11-83975; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; (33.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Transaction Assessment: 54.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase Filed (open event)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less