This case was last updated from Fort Bend County Justice Courts on 03/24/2023 at 16:27:10 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Eric J Cowgill

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eric J Cowgill. This case was filed in Fort Bend County Justice Courts, Fort Bend County Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Fort Bend, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5414

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fort Bend, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Cowgill, Eric J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Jamila B Lloyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAffidavit; Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Citation Service; Cowgill, Eric J; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; State Credit: (21.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; E-filing; Receipt # 21-104867; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; (33.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Transaction Assessment: 54.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase Filed (open event)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less