This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 07/03/2023 at 09:31:17 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Demetria Mccall

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Demetria Mccall. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judge overseeing this case is Garner, Roderick. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5682

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Garner, Roderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Mccall, Demetria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Jamila B Lloyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAffidavit; Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit; (Judicial Officer: Garner, Roderick)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice; NOTICE OF NON-SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Citation Service; Mccall, Demetria; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; State Credit: (21.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; E-filing; Receipt # 21-105540; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; (33.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Transaction Assessment: 54.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase Filed (open event)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less