This case was last updated from Fort Bend County District Courts on 05/13/2023 at 15:19:12 (UTC).

Leslie Garcia, Nathyely Garcia, and Yesenia Garcia v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 Leslie Garcia, Nathyely Garcia, and Yesenia Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Fort Bend County District Courts, Fort Bend County District Justice Center located in Fort Bend, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1554

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fort Bend, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Garcia, Leslie

Garcia, Nathyely

Garcia, Yesenia

Defendant and Respondent

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Joshua Ray Willoughby

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Adaugo Duru

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketAmended Filing Index # 8; Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • FinancialDefendant or Respondent: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; E-filing; Receipt # 2023-13546-DCLK; Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; (10.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • FinancialDefendant or Respondent: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Transaction Assessment: 10.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6; Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company's Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketJury Demand Index # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOfficers Return Index # 5; Citation Return for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company Served on 3/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketIssuance Index # 4; Citation Issued to Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCitation; Eservice; Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Served; 03/09/2023; Returned; 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Garcia, Leslie; Total Financial Assessment: 368.00; Total Payments and Credits: 368.00; E-filing; Receipt # 2023-08054-DCLK; Garcia, Leslie; (8.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Garcia, Leslie; Total Financial Assessment: 368.00; Total Payments and Credits: 368.00; Transaction Assessment: 8.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketRequest Index # 3; Request for Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Garcia, Leslie; Total Financial Assessment: 368.00; Total Payments and Credits: 368.00; State Credit: (137.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Garcia, Leslie; Total Financial Assessment: 368.00; Total Payments and Credits: 368.00; E-filing; Receipt # 2023-06879-DCLK; Garcia, Leslie; (223.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Garcia, Leslie; Total Financial Assessment: 368.00; Total Payments and Credits: 368.00; Transaction Assessment: 360.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketPetition Index # 1; Plaintiffs' Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketJury Demand Index # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less