This case was last updated from Fort Bend County District Courts on 11/22/2023 at 19:44:18 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Annette Marie Bouvier LaSala and Carl Joseph LaSala, Jr. and in the Interest of Minor Child(ren)

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 In the Matter of the Marriage of Annette Marie Bouvier LaSala and Carl Joseph LaSala, Jr and in the Interest of Minor Child ren was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Fort Bend County District Courts, Fort Bend County District Justice Center located in Fort Bend, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9478

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Fort Bend, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Petitioner

LaSala, Annette Marie Bouvier

Respondent, Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

LaSala, Carl Joseph, Jr

Not Classified By Court

LaSala, Nicole Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Petitioner Attorney

Sam M.(Trey) Yates, III

Respondent, Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Joseph Indelicato, Jr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2023

DocketOrder Index # 16; Order on Agreed Motion for Substitution of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketJudge Docket Entry; The Court reviewed an Agreed M/substitution of counsel. Client has approved the motion. Motion granted. Atty. Duff is discharged as attorney of record. Atty. Yates now represents Annette Lasala. The court signed the Agreed Order. lmc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketJudge Docket Entry; The court reviewed the agreed order. All signatures must be distinctive written signatures or electronic generated by the signing party. Agreed orders may not be signed by permission or using "/s/ Typed Name." An updated order may be filed for the court's review and signature. Returned unsigned. lmc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketMotion (No Fee) Index # 14; Agreed Motion for Substitution of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketProposed Order Index # 15; Order on Agreed Motion for Substitution of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketCertificate Index # 13; Certificate of Completion - The Texas Cooperative Parenting Course

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketNo Fee Documents Index # 12; Rule 11 Agreement Regarding Inventory and Appraisements

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketNo Fee Documents Index # 11; Rule 11 Agreement Regarding Inventory and Appraisements

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketCertificate Index # 10; Certificate of Delivery of Discovery Documents

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

FinancialCross Plaintiff: LaSala, Carl Joseph, Jr; Total Financial Assessment: 80.00; Total Payments and Credits: 80.00; State Credit: (45.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
12/15/2022

DocketCitation; eService; LaSala, Carl Joseph, Jr; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022

DocketLetters; Refund Letter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketJudge Docket Entry; The court reviewed a TRO and Order Setting Hearing. Standing Mutual Injunctions in place. Order setting hearing is blank. No request for extraordinary relief. Movant may contact the court coordinator for an approved hearing date and submit a Notice of Hearing. lmc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

FinancialCounter-Defendant: LaSala, Annette Marie Bouvier; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; State Credit: (137.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

FinancialCounter-Defendant: LaSala, Annette Marie Bouvier; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; E-filing; Receipt # 2022-42484-DCLK; LaSala, Annette Marie Bouvier; (229.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

FinancialCounter-Defendant: LaSala, Annette Marie Bouvier; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Transaction Assessment: 366.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketPetition Index # 1; Original Petition for Divorce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketProposed Order Index # 2; Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketRequest Index # 3; Request for Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketOrder Index # 4; Standing Temporary Mutual Injunctions Divorce with Children

[+] Read More [-] Read Less