This case was last updated from Fort Bend County Courts on 11/22/2023 at 14:06:15 (UTC).

Waste Management of Texas, Inc., vs Mobile Home City, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/05/2023 Waste Management of Texas, Inc , filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mobile Home City, Inc. This case was filed in Fort Bend County Courts, Fort Bend County Justice Center located in Fort Bend, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3428

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fort Bend, Texas

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Waste Management of Texas Inc

Defendant and Respondent

Mobile Home City Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Ian A McCarthy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/23/2023

DocketOrder; on Nonsuit - Signed 10/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketDismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketCitation; Mobile Home City, Inc. (registered agent John F. Gerner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketCitation; Mobile Home City Inc; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Waste Management of Texas Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; State Credit: (137.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Waste Management of Texas Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; E-filing; Receipt # 2023-12518-CCLK; Waste Management of Texas Inc; (221.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Waste Management of Texas Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Transaction Assessment: 358.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketDocket Sheet; qc/ma/lb

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketOriginal Petition; Plaintiff's Original Petition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketRequest; Citation Request

[+] Read More [-] Read Less