This case was last updated from Fort Bend County District Courts on 12/03/2023 at 16:01:55 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, Na. v. Bank of America, Na

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 Wells Fargo Bank, Na filed an Other lawsuit against Bank of America, Na. This case was filed in Fort Bend County District Courts, Fort Bend County District Justice Center located in Fort Bend, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9049

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fort Bend, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Wells Fargo Bank, Na.

Respondent and Defendant

Jones, Andrew M

Garnishee

Bank of America, Na

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Thomas M. Sellers

Garnishee Attorney

Evan A Moeller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2023

DocketAnswer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4; Garnishee Bank of America, N.A.'s Original Answer to Writ of Garnishment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketNotice Index # 3; Notice of Garnishment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketIssuance Index # 2; Writ of Garnishment Issued to Bank of America NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketGarnishment; Email; Bank of America, Na; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, Na.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; State Credit: (137.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, Na.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; E-filing; Receipt # 2023-36394-DCLK; Wells Fargo Bank, Na.; (221.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, Na.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Transaction Assessment: 358.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketPetition Index # 1; Application for Writ of Garnishment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less