This case was last updated from Fort Bend County Justice Courts on 11/22/2023 at 23:01:11 (UTC).

Jason Wong vs Amica Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 Jason Wong filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Amica Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in Fort Bend County Justice Courts, Fort Bend County Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Fort Bend, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rash, Sonia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0670

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fort Bend, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rash, Sonia

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Wong, Jason

Defendant

Amica Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Eric B. Dick, LL.M.

Defendant Attorney

Joanna Salinas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2023

DocketHearing; (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Rash, Sonia)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketJudge Trial; Summary Disposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketFiling; defendant's internet form -appearing remotely

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketCourt Notice; defendant's motion for summary disposition -emailed/mailed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketMotion (No Fee); defendant's motion for summary disposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Wong, Jason; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; E-filing; Receipt # 31-206426; Wong, Jason; (54.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Wong, Jason; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Transaction Assessment: 54.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketNotice; Notice Letter for Filing Fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

FinancialPlaintiff or Petitioner: Wong, Jason; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Transaction Assessment: 54.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCase Filed (open event); certified transcript & index of case filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketOriginal Petition; filed 10/21/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCitation Return; debt claim/small claim citation, and citation return filed 10/21/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketMotion (No Fee); to dismiss for DWOP & motion to retain

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketOrder; granting motion to transfer venue to JP3 FBC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketFiling; Plaintiff's exhibit A & B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketNotice; of pending court costs -emailed/mailed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketAnswer/Response; defendant's answer, and motion to transfer venue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less