This case was last updated from El Paso County District Courts on 03/30/2019 at 19:00:21 (UTC).

WESTERN REFINING COMPANY, L.P. vs ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY,GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE COMPANY,XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC.,SWISS REINSURANCE AMERICA CORPORATION,NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY,RORUS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY,BRIT INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 12/21/2012 WESTERN REFINING COMPANY, L P filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY,GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE COMPANY,XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC ,SWISS REINSURANCE AMERICA CORPORATION,NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY,RORUS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY,BRIT INSURANCE. This case was filed in El Paso County District Courts, El Paso District Court located in El Paso, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Barill, Angie Juarez. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7225

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    El Paso, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Barill, Angie Juarez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

WESTERN REFINING COMPANY, L.P.

WESTERN REFINING, INC.

WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

VICTOR F POULOS

J WILEY GEORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/05/2015

DocketCertificate of Deposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2014

DocketMotion to Dismiss

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2014

DocketCANCELED; Docket Call; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez); Settled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2014

DocketCANCELED; Final Pre-Trial Hearing; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez); Settled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2014

DocketMotion in Limine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2014

DocketWitness List

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2014

DocketWitness List

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2014

DocketMotion in Limine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2014

DocketOrder Denying

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2014

DocketMotion Hearing; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
221 More Docket Entries
01/31/2013

DocketRule 11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2013

DocketCitation; GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA; Unserved Response Received 04/02/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2012

DocketCitation; NATIONAL UNION INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH; Unserved; ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY; Unserved Response Received 04/02/2013; GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE COMPANY; Unserved Response Received 04/02/2013; LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY; Unserved; XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC.; Unserved Response Received 04/02/2013; INDUSTRIAL RISK INSURERS ON BEHALF OF IT; Unserved Response Received 04/02/2013; SWISS REINSURANCE AMERICA CORPORATION; Unserved; NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY; Unserved Response Received 04/02/2013; RORUS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Unserved; LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Unserved; ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY; Unserved; UNDERWRITING RISK SERVICES/VALIDUS ON BEHALF OF LLOYD'S TALBOT SYNDICATE 1183; Unserved; BRIT INSURANCE; Unserved Response Received 04/02/2013; TORUS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Unserved Response Received 04/02/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2012

DocketCase Information Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2012

DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2015

DocketAgreed Order; (Judicial Officer: Barill, Angie Juarez); Comment (OF DISMISSAL/signed 12-05-14/ as to allianz global risks us insurance company only)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2014

DocketAgreed Order; (Judicial Officer: Barill, Angie Juarez); Comment (signed 09-29-14/defs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2014

DocketAgreed Order; (Judicial Officer: Barill, Angie Juarez); Comment (of dismissal/torus specialty insurance company/signed 03-28-14)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2013

DocketAgreed Order; (Judicial Officer: Barill, Angie Juarez); Comment (OF DISMISSAL/ SIGNED BY JUDGE ON 05/28/13)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2013

DocketAgreed Order; (Judicial Officer: Barill, Angie Juarez); Comment (OF DISMISSAL/ SIGNED BY JUDGE ON 04/23/13)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less