This case was last updated from El Paso County District Courts on 06/15/2023 at 14:13:55 (UTC).

The Avanza Group, LLC vs. Statewide Logistics LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 The Avanza Group, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Statewide Logistics LLC. This case was filed in El Paso County District Courts, El Paso District Court located in El Paso, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Perez, Annabell. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1598

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    El Paso, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Perez, Annabell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Avanza Group, LLC

Defendant

Statewide Logistics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN E PRICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketReturned Mail Index # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DispositionForeign Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Perez, Annabell); Comment (SIGNED ON 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Foreign Judgment Sent Index # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketE-File Event Original Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less