This case was last updated from Denton County District Courts on 09/23/2023 at 06:14:45 (UTC).

Russell Hoffman, Wendy Hoffman, Joe Perry, Penny Perry, Mike Kinzley and Kristy Kinzley vs. AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company d/b/a AT&T Texas GD Construction, Inc., J. Tucker Construction, Inc., Jason J. Tucker, Tammy Jane T

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 Russell Hoffman, Wendy Hoffman, Joe Perry, Penny Perry, Mike Kinzley and Kristy Kinzley filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AT T Corp , AT T Inc , Southwestern Bell Telephone Company d/b/a AT T Texas GD Construction, Inc , J Tucker Construction, Inc , Jason J Tucker, Tammy Jane T. This case was filed in Denton County District Court, Denton County District Court located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Johnson, James S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-431

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Johnson, James S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hoffman, Russell

Hoffman, Wendy

Kinzley, Kristy

Kinzley, Mike

Perry, Joe

Perry, Penny

Defendants

AT&T Corp.

AT&T Inc

Does 1-50, John

GD Construction, Inc.

J. Tucker Construction, Inc.

Southwestern Bell Telephone Company Doing Business As AT&T Texas

Tucker, Jason J.

Tucker, Tammy Jane

Aguilar, Mauricio

AT&T Systems, Inc.

Diaz, Juan Carlos

Hernandez, Ruben

Ramirez, Jose

Rojero, Saul Herrera

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoff J Henley

Defendant Attorneys

Tania Sethi

Stacy H. Thompson

Jerry L. Ewing, Jr.

Douglas D. Fletcher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer; and Affirmative Defenses; Party: Draftpros LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketAttorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from: Stacy Thompson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer; (Jose Ramirez); Party: Ramirez, Jose

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation to Draftpros LLC; Party: Draftpros LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketCover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Jovanny Vazquez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Saul Herrera Rojero

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Jose Ramirez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Ruben Hernandez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Juan Carlos Diaz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer; The AT&T Parties' Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Application for Declaratory Relief; Party: AT&T Corp. Party: AT&T Inc; Party: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer; Party: J. Tucker Construction, Inc. Party: Tucker, Jason J. Party: Tucker, Tammy Jane

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation to Southwestern Bell Telephone Company; Party: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketCover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Hoffman, Russell; Total Financial Assessment: 462.00; Total Payments and Credits: 462.00; State Credit: (137.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Hoffman, Russell; Total Financial Assessment: 462.00; Total Payments and Credits: 462.00; TexFile Payment; Receipt # 2023-4618; Hoffman, Russell; (269.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Hoffman, Russell; Total Financial Assessment: 462.00; Total Payments and Credits: 462.00; Transaction Assessment: 406.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCitation; Env # 72762729; AT&T Corp. Unserved; AT&T Inc; Unserved; Southwestern Bell Telephone Company; Served; 03/08/2023; Returned; 03/27/2023; GD Construction, Inc. Served; 03/24/2023; Returned; 08/04/2023; J. Tucker Construction, Inc. Unserved; Tucker, Jason J. Unserved; Tucker, Tammy Jane; Served; 03/22/2023; Returned; 08/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition; and Application for Declaratory Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of; Citation x7; Made by: Hoffman, Russell; Made by: Hoffman, Wendy; Made by: Kinzley, Kristy; Made by: Kinzley, Mike; Made by: Perry, Joe; Made by: Perry, Penny

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less