This case was last updated from Denton County Justice Courts on 03/26/2023 at 03:06:16 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs Jeffrey S Rideout

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeffrey S Rideout. This case was filed in Denton County Justice Courts, Denton County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Oglesby, Mike. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******90J5

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Oglesby, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendant

Rideout, Jeffrey S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamila B. Lloyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketReset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketTrial by Judge; Pl Atty John Kettler/ Def appeared in person

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketTrial by Judge; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer: Oglesby, Mike)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCorrespondence; at counter by Def

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; E-Filed to Pl Atty/Mailed to Def

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Answer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Served; Citation Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; State Credit: (21.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; E-File Payment; Receipt # 211170-2022-JP5; Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; (33.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Transaction Assessment: 54.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCitation; Rideout, Jeffrey S; Served; 11/21/2022; Response Due; 12/05/2022; Returned; 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued - ABC Legal; E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less