This case was last updated from Denton County District Courts on 09/25/2023 at 02:00:38 (UTC).

Lauren Sinno, Melissa Betten, Justin Gow, Monica McCormick and Spencer Turner vs. AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company D/B/A AT&T Texas, GD Construction, Inc., J. Tucker Construction, Inc., Jason J. Tucker, Tammy Jane Tucker and

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 Lauren Sinno, Melissa Betten, Justin Gow, Monica McCormick and Spencer Turner filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AT T Corp , AT T Inc , Southwestern Bell Telephone Company D/B/A AT T Texas, GD Construction, Inc , J Tucker Construction, Inc , Jason J Tucker, Tammy Jane Tucker and. This case was filed in Denton County District Court, Denton County District Court located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Johnson, James S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-431

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Johnson, James S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Betten, Melissa

Gow, Justin

McCormick, Monica

Sinno, Lauren

Turner, Spencer

Defendants

AT&T Corp.

AT&T Inc

Does 1-50, John

GD Construction, Inc.

J. Tucker Construction, Inc.

Southwestern Bell Telephone Company

Tucker, Jason J.

Tucker, Tammy Jane

Aguilar, Mauricio

AT&T Systems, Inc.

Diaz, Juan Carlos

Hernandez, Ruben

Herrera Rojero, Saul

Ramirez, Jose

Vazquez, Jovany Doing Business As Wiretechs

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoff J Henley

Defendant Attorneys

Tania Sethi

Stacy H. Thompson

Jerry L. Ewing, Jr.

Clinton D. Howie

Douglas D. Fletcher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer; Draftpros, LLC's and Affirmative Defenses; Party: Draftpros LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketAttorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from: Stacy Thompson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer; Party: Ramirez, Jose

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Draftpros LLC; Party: Draftpros LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketCover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketCover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Jovany Vasquez; Party: Vazquez, Jovany

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Saul Herrera Rojero; Party: Herrera Rojero, Saul

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Jose Ramirez; Party: Diaz, Juan Carlos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation Ruben Hernandez; Party: Hernandez, Ruben

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer; The AT&T Parties' Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Application for Declaratory Relief; Party: AT&T Corp. Party: AT&T Inc; Party: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer; Party: J. Tucker Construction, Inc. Party: Tucker, Jason J. Party: Tucker, Tammy Jane

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketService Returned; Citation to Southwestern Bell; Party: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketCover Letter; Re: Executed Citations of Service on Defendants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Sinno, Lauren; Total Financial Assessment: 462.00; Total Payments and Credits: 462.00; State Credit: (137.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Sinno, Lauren; Total Financial Assessment: 462.00; Total Payments and Credits: 462.00; TexFile Payment; Receipt # 2023-4657; Sinno, Lauren; (269.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Sinno, Lauren; Total Financial Assessment: 462.00; Total Payments and Credits: 462.00; Transaction Assessment: 406.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCitation; Env# 72778202; AT&T Corp. Unserved; AT&T Inc; Unserved; Southwestern Bell Telephone Company; Served; 03/08/2023; Returned; 03/27/2023; GD Construction, Inc. Served; 03/24/2023; Returned; 08/04/2023; J. Tucker Construction, Inc. Unserved; Tucker, Jason J. Unserved; Tucker, Tammy Jane; Served; 03/22/2023; Returned; 08/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition; and Application for Declaratory Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of; Citation; Made by: Betten, Melissa; Made by: Gow, Justin; Made by: McCormick, Monica; Made by: Sinno, Lauren; Made by: Turner, Spencer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less