This case was last updated from Denton County District Courts on 05/04/2023 at 15:05:31 (UTC).

In Re: Order of Foreclosure Concerning 3468 Misty Meadow Dr, Dallas, TX 75287 Under Tex. R. Civ. P. 736 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Richard B Davis and Pamela B Davis

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 In Re Order of Foreclosure Concerning 3468 Misty Meadow Dr, Dallas, TX 75287 Under Tex R Civ P 736 Wells Fargo Bank, N A Richard B Davis and Pamela B Davis was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Denton County District Court, Denton County District Court located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Johnson, James S.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-431

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Johnson, James S.

 

Party Details

Respondents

Davis, Pamela B

Davis, Richard B

Applicant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

James A. Frappier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Davis, Pamela B; Party: Davis, Richard B; Party: Frappier, James A. Party: Occupant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketFinal Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case); (Judicial Officer: Johnson, James S. ); Default Order; for Parties: Davis, Pamela B; for Parties: Davis, Richard B; for Parties: Occupant; for Parties: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Military Status; Declaration of James A. Frappier; Regarding: Davis, Pamela B; Regarding: Davis, Richard B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address; Certificate of Last Known Address; Party: Davis, Pamela B; Party: Davis, Richard B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Petitioner's Motion for Default; Party: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketSignature Confirmation Page for Certified Mailer; Citation by Certified Mail to Occupant; Returned to Sender; Mailed to: Occupant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketForeclosure Citation Returned Undelivered; Citation by Certified Mail to Occupant; Party: Occupant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketRecord/Copy Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialApplicant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 836.00; Total Payments and Credits: 836.00; State Credit: (137.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialApplicant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 836.00; Total Payments and Credits: 836.00; TexFile Payment; Receipt # 2023-5878; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; (699.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialApplicant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 836.00; Total Payments and Credits: 836.00; Transaction Assessment: 836.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCitation by First Class Mail; Occupant; Served; 02/24/2023; Davis, Richard B; Served; 02/24/2023; Davis, Pamela B; Served; 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCitation By Certified Mail; Davis, Richard B; Served; 02/24/2023; Davis, Pamela B; Served; 02/24/2023; Occupant; Served; 02/24/2023; Returned; 04/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of; Citation x3; Made by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketApplication for Foreclosure; an Expedited Order Under Rule 736 on a Home Equity, or Home Equity Line of Credit Loan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less