This case was last updated from Denton County Justice Courts on 09/03/2023 at 11:03:57 (UTC).

Daimler Trust vs Taylor Campbell, Sheree Campbell

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 Daimler Trust filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Taylor Campbell, Sheree Campbell. This case was filed in Denton County Justice Courts, Denton County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hughey, Harris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****33J4

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hughey, Harris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daimler Trust

Defendants

Campbell, Sheree

Campbell, Taylor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCitation Served; service fee $86.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCitation Served; service fee $86.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketCitation Sent to Plaintiff/Process Server via E-mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCitation; Campbell, Sheree; Served; 04/29/2023; Response Due; 05/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCitation; Campbell, Taylor; Served; 04/29/2023; Response Due; 05/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Daimler Trust; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; State Credit: (21.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Daimler Trust; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; E-File Payment; Receipt # 00810-2023-J4; Daimler Trust; (33.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Daimler Trust; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Transaction Assessment: 54.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition; [emailprotected]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less