This case was last updated from Denton County Courts on 06/23/2023 at 09:03:54 (UTC).

Capital One N.A. VS. John Mcgillion

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Capital One N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against John Mcgillion. This case was filed in Denton County Courts, Denton County Court at Law 2 located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez, Robert C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1717

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez, Robert C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One N.A.

Defendant

Mcgillion, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Strain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketService Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketOrder for Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketProof; Declaration in Support

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Capital One N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; State Credit: (137.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Capital One N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; TexFile Payment; Receipt # 2023-2520; Capital One N.A.; (221.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Capital One N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Transaction Assessment: 358.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketService Issued; TexFile to; [emailprotected]; per request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCitation; TexFile to; [emailprotected]; per request; Mcgillion, John; Served; 06/15/2023; Returned; 06/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less