This case was last updated from Denton County Courts on 06/23/2023 at 09:04:50 (UTC).

Bank Of America N.A. VS. Jean Nicole Bergstrasser

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Bank Of America N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jean Nicole Bergstrasser. This case was filed in Denton County Courts, Denton County Court at Law 2 located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez, Robert C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1729

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez, Robert C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America N.A.

Defendant

Bergstrasser, Jean Nicole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketService Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketOrder for Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketProof; Declaration in Support

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCitation; efiled to; [emailprotected]; Bergstrasser, Jean Nicole; Served; 06/17/2023; Returned; 06/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Bank Of America N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; State Credit: (137.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Bank Of America N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; TexFile Payment; Receipt # 2023-2533; Bank Of America N.a.; (221.00);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialPlaintiff: Bank Of America N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Transaction Assessment: 358.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketService Issued; Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCover Letter or Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less