This case was last updated from Denton County District Courts on 11/21/2023 at 19:03:05 (UTC).

Evolution Spine LLC v. Texas Surgical Hospital and Canyon Atlantic - Plano, LLC d/b/a Texas Surgical Hospital

Case Summary

On 07/14/2023 Evolution Spine LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Texas Surgical Hospital and Canyon Atlantic - Plano, LLC d/b/a Texas Surgical Hospital. This case was filed in Denton County District Court, Denton County District Court located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Jones, Derbha H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-467

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Jones, Derbha H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evolution Spine LLC

Defendants

Canyon Atlantic - Plano, LLC

Texas Surgical Hospital Doing Business As Canyon Atlantic - Plano, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew S. Muckleroy

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy D. Camp

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023

DocketUnable to Deliver Notice or Order Electronically; No Email Address on File; Party: Texas Surgical Hospital

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketNotice or Order Electronically Delivered; Sent to:: Camp, Jeremy D. Sent to:: Muckleroy, Matthew S.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketAgreed Order; (Judicial Officer: Jones, Derbha H. ); Agreed Protective Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDefendant's Original Answer; Canyon Atlantic-Plano, LLC's

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketService Returned; Citation for Canyon Atlantic-Plano

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketService Returned; Citation for Texas Surgical Hospital LLC; Party: Texas Surgical Hospital

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Evolution Spine LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; TexFile Payment; Receipt # 2023-23076; Evolution Spine LLC; (16.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Evolution Spine LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Transaction Assessment: 16.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketCitation; E-served in Env #77982047; Texas Surgical Hospital; Served; 07/31/2023; Returned; 07/31/2023; Canyon Atlantic - Plano, LLC; Served; 08/01/2023; Returned; 08/04/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketRequest for Issuance of; Citations; Made by: Evolution Spine LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Evolution Spine LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; State Credit: (137.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Evolution Spine LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; TexFile Payment; Receipt # 2023-21760; Evolution Spine LLC; (213.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Evolution Spine LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Transaction Assessment: 350.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less