This case was last updated from Denton County Courts on 09/09/2023 at 15:01:33 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. VS. Suzanne Ruth Thomas

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Suzanne Ruth Thomas. This case was filed in Denton County Courts, Denton County Court at Law 2 located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez, Robert C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1730

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez, Robert C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant

Thomas, Suzanne Ruth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Defendant Attorney

David J. Shuster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/25/2023

DocketCover Letter; David J Shuster -Certificate of Written Discovery

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketAnswer(s) and/or Response(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketService Returned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketCitation; Thomas, Suzanne Ruth; Served; 05/30/2023; Returned; 06/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; State Credit: (137.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; TexFile Payment; Receipt # 2023-2534; Bank Of America N.a.; (221.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Transaction Assessment: 358.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketService Issued; efile to; [emailprotected]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketCover Letter or Request

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less