This case was last updated from Denton County Justice Courts on 10/20/2023 at 09:11:09 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs John Franz

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against John Franz. This case was filed in Denton County Justice Courts, Denton County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Denton, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DePiazza, James R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******80J2

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Denton, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DePiazza, James R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Franz, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/09/2023

DocketOnline Dispute Resolution Notice Sent; mailed and efiled to def / efiled to pla envelope 80396367

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketOrder to Mediation - Online Dispute Resolution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketAnswer Filed; Party: Franz, John

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketService Return Affidavit; $140.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCitation; Franz, John; Served; 09/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; State Credit: (21.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; E-File Payment; Receipt # 126538-J2; Discover Bank; (33.00);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialPlaintiff: Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Transaction Assessment: 54.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketService Request; abc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less