This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/01/2022 at 11:22:11 (UTC).

WTHW, LTD. vs. MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATEDet al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 WTHW, LTD filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER SMITH INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6708

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WTHW, LTD.

Defendants

PIERCE, MERRILL LYNCH

FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED

1999 Bryan Street Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCHANAN, ROBERT G, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

OPITZ, JUSTIN R

 

Court Documents

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT: ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-MERRILL LYNCH , PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORP

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT NOTICE-ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT NOTICE-GEORGE E. NORDGREN

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

MAILED TO JUSTIN OPITZ

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT TO PARTIES

MAILED TO FENNER AND SMITH INCORPORATED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT TO PARTIES

MAILED TO GEORGE NORDGREN

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT TO PARTIES

MAILED TO ROBERT BUCHANAN

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT TO PARTIES

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NONSUIT

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

EXECUTED NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT - GEORGE E. NORDGREN

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT - GEORGE E. NORDGREN

EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT NOTICE-ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT NOTICE-GEORGE E. NORDGREN

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT: ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-MERRILL LYNCH , PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORP

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; WTHW, LTD.; Awarded Against:; et al

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; WTHW, LTD.: Awarded Against:; et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT - GEORGE E. NORDGREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Served: 12/03/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 12/14/2021: Comment; GEORGE E. NORDGREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Served: 12/02/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CONSTABLE 1: Returned; 12/06/2021: Comment; MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WTHW, LTD. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 76425-2021-DCLK; WTHW, LTD. $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WTHW, LTD. : Transaction Assessment; ; $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: WTHW, LTD. ; Total Financial Assessment $316.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fenner & Smith is a litigant

Latest cases where Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OPITZ, JUSTIN R