This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 03:28:55 (UTC).

WILMER HERNANDEZ HERRERA, et al vs. RITZA CAROLINA PONCE, et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 WILMER HERNANDEZ HERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RITZA CAROLINA PONCE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2011

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ HERRERA, WILMER

HERNANDEZ, OLVIN ALEXIS

Defendants

PONCE, RITZA CAROLINA

Dallas, TX 75228

PONCE, CINDY

Dallas, TX 75227

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAMIEH, RAMEZ

Defendant Attorneys

CAREY, J KEVIN

REILY, READ H

 

Court Documents

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTRONEY

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: (LEVEL 3)

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

EXECUTED CITATION - RITZA CAROLINA PONCE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RITZA CAROLINA PONCE

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: 1st REQUEST BY EMAIL TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 45 DAYS

ISSUE CITATION - RITZA CAROLINA PONCE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - CINDY PONCE

ISSUE CITATION

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTRONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: (LEVEL 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PONCE, RITZA CAROLINA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 21586-2022-DCLK; PONCE, RITZA CAROLINA $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PONCE, RITZA CAROLINA : Transaction Assessment; ; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: PONCE, RITZA CAROLINA ; Total Financial Assessment $10.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: CINDY PONCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/28/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 04/04/2022: Comment; RITZA CAROLINA PONCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERNANDEZ HERRERA, WILMER : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERNANDEZ HERRERA, WILMER : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 10523-2022-DCLK; HERNANDEZ HERRERA, WILMER $239.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERNANDEZ HERRERA, WILMER : Transaction Assessment; ; $376.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: HERNANDEZ HERRERA, WILMER ; Total Financial Assessment $376.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $376.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REILY, READ H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Kevin Carey