This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/24/2022 at 21:17:48 (UTC).

VMY PROPERTIES, LLC vs. DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 VMY PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9073

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VMY PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant

DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

2949 North Stemmons Freeway

Dallas, TX 75247-6195

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLACKWELL, MELINDA D.

BLACKWELL, MELINDA D

Defendant Attorney

METCALF, BRADEN W.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: Cover Letter

ISSUE CITATION-DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/15/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 08/18/2022: Comment; DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for VMY PROPERTIES, LLC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for VMY PROPERTIES, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 48487-2022-DCLK; VMY Properties, LLC $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for VMY PROPERTIES, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: VMY PROPERTIES, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VMY PROPERTIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer METCALF, BRADEN W.