This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/17/2022 at 01:11:42 (UTC).

VICTORIA MENDOZAet al vs. 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 VICTORIA MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5469

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MENDOZA, VICTORIA

MENDOZA, RICK

MENDOZA, ANGELO

Defendants

3M COMPANY

CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.

ELLIOTT COMPANY

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

VIACOMCBS INC.

VIAD CORP

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC.

350 N St Paul St Ste 2900

Dallas, TX 75201-4234

MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

ALFA LAVAL, INC.

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

C/O Lynette Jones, 13320 Ballantyne Corporate Pl

Charlotte, NC 28277

CARRIER CORPORATION

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

AQUA-CHEM INC

COPES VULCAN, INC. COMPANY

CRANE CO.

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY

THE DURIRON COMPANY INC

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL, DARREN

Defendant Attorneys

WARE, JAMES L

KUGLER, LAURA ELIZABETH

Other Attorneys

PRAZAK, JONATHAN

STRELITZ, PETER J.

SPRAGUE, WESLEY TYLER

 

Court Documents

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ISSUE CITATION - FMC CORPORATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - FLOWSERVE US INC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - ELLIOTT COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - CLEAVER-BROOKS INC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - CARRIER CORPORATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - CRANE CO

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 3M COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION //THE ORIGINAL CITATION WAS ISSUED ON 06/14/2022 AND RETURNED 06/24/2022 EXECUTED HOWEVER; A DUPLICATE COPY OF THE SAME WAS SERVED ON 08/03/2022 EXECUTED RETURNED ON 08/03/2022 WITHOUT PAYING THE $8.00 FEE FOR RE-ISSUANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION //THE ORIGINAL CITATION WAS ISSUED ON 06/14/2022 AND RETURNED ON 06/24/2022 EXECUTED HOWEVER; A DUPLICATE COPY OF THE SAME WAS SERVED ON 07/14/2022 RETURNED ON 07/27/2022 WITHOUT PAYING THE $8.00 FEE FOR RE-ISSUANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FMC CORPORATION : STATE CREDIT; ; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FMC CORPORATION : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 43499-2022-DCLK; FMC CORPORATION $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FMC CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: FMC CORPORATION ; Total Financial Assessment $80.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS CLAIM; Comment: CROSBY VALVE LLC - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MENDOZA, VICTORIA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MENDOZA, VICTORIA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 31737-2022-DCLK; MENDOZA, VICTORIA $429.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MENDOZA, VICTORIA : Transaction Assessment; ; $566.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: MENDOZA, VICTORIA ; Total Financial Assessment $566.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $566.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAVER BROOKS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where COPES-VULCAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AQUA-CHEM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Dial Corporation is a litigant