This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/23/2023 at 20:28:41 (UTC).

VERITAS VINCIT, LLC, et al vs. FRED ALAN BROWN, et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 VERITAS VINCIT, LLC, filed an Other lawsuit against FRED ALAN BROWN,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MOYE', ERIC and WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7503

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MOYE', ERIC

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VERITAS VINCIT, LLC

DEAN, WILLIAM BERRY, III

Defendants

BROWN, FRED ALAN

DURHAM, CHARLES WILLIAM, II

RETICULUM MANAGEMENT, LLC

BIRNAM WOOD CAPITAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZWEBER, MICHAEL

CHARHON, BRETT

Defendant Attorney

TROWBRIDGE, CHRISTOPHER B

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON MOTION TO DISMISS

AMENDED OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE

MOTION - LEAVE; Comment: AMENDED OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION - PROTECT

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

NOTICE OF HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

MOTION - COMPEL; Comment: RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

2ND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: 2ND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; Comment: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

EXECUTED CITATION - RETICULUM MANAGEMENT LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RETICULUM MANAGEMENT LLC

LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION - RETICULUM MANAGEMENT, LLC

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

EXECUTED CITATION - RETICULUM MANAGEMENT LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RETICULUM MANAGEMENT LLC

ISSUE CITATION - RETICULUM MANAGEMENT, LLC

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR FOF/CONCLUSION OF LAW

REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW

EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - THE PETTIT LAW FIRM PC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - THE PETTIT LAW FIRM PC

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: MOYE', ERIC; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: MOYE', ERIC; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; DEAN, WILLIAM BERRY, III: Awarded Against:; DEAN, WILLIAM BERRY, III

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022

DocketREACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; Comment: Plaintiffs' Notice of Removal to U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMotion - Compel; Judicial Officer: MOYE', ERIC; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: SET BRETT CHARHOM 469-587-7251 CC REQ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; Comment: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2022

FinancialFinancial info for VERITAS VINCIT, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 53425-2022-DCLK; VERITAS VINCIT, LLC $8.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2022

FinancialFinancial info for VERITAS VINCIT, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
118 More Docket Entries
12/20/2021

DocketCITATION; Served: 02/16/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 02/25/2022: Comment; FRED ALAN BROWN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketCITATION; Served: 01/03/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/05/2022: Comment; CHARLES WILLIAM DURHAM, II

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketCITATION; Served: 01/03/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/05/2022: Comment; RETICULUM MANAGEMENT, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketCITATION; Served: 01/03/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/05/2022: Comment; BIRNAM WOOD CAPITAL, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

FinancialFinancial info for VERITAS VINCIT, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 81333-2021-DCLK; VERITAS VINCIT, LLC $324.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

FinancialFinancial info for VERITAS VINCIT, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $324.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

FinancialFinancial: VERITAS VINCIT, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $502.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $502.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2021

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less