This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/07/2022 at 14:04:44 (UTC).

TRINITY ANETEKHAI vs. BRIAN D. HAZLETT, UNITED PETROLEUM TRANSPORTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 TRINITY ANETEKHAI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIAN D HAZLETT, UNITED PETROLEUM TRANSPORTS, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are GREENBERG, MARK and RENTERIA, JUAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********75-E

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

GREENBERG, MARK

RENTERIA, JUAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANETEKHAI, TRINITY

Hill, TX 75104

Defendants

HAZLETT, BRIAN d.

Carrollton, TX 75006

UNITED PETROLEUM TRANSPORTS, INC.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARBER, SCOTT ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

COLLINS, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: MAILED BACK 9/2/21-SJ

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: MAILED BACK 9/2/21-SJ

1 CCL#5 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: GREENBERG, MARK; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER - NONSUIT DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER - NONSUIT DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

MOTION FOR NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION - NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

BRIAN D HAZLETT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: BRIAN D HAZLETT

1 CCL#5 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: RENTERIA, JUAN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

ORIGINAL ASWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

Order for Motion to Retain.pdf

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR MOTION TO RETAIN

PLTF MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RETAIN

RETURN

OF SERVICE; RETURN: Comment; UNITED PETROLEUM TRANSPRT, INC

UNITED PETROLEUM TRANSPORTS INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNITED PETROLEUM TRANSPORTS INC ON 01/03/2022

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NONSUIT DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: BRIAN D HAZLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: RENTERIA, JUAN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR MOTION TO RETAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - RETAIN; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RETAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: RETAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - RETAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 01/10/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/12/2022: Served; 01/03/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Returned: 01/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANETEKHAI, TRINITY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2021-09029; ANETEKHAI, TRINITY $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANETEKHAI, TRINITY : Transaction Assessment; ; $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: ANETEKHAI, TRINITY ; Total Financial Assessment $295.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: MAILED BACK 9/2/21-SJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Petroleum Transports Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS, ROBERT