This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/11/2022 at 07:28:53 (UTC).

TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC, et al vs. DUKE, INC. GENERAL CONTRACTORS

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUKE, INC GENERAL CONTRACTORS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6454

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC

700 N. Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Transform SR Holding Management, LLC

700 N. Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

DUKE, INC. GENERAL CONTRACTORS

13740 Midway Rd, Suite 804

Dallas, TX 75244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOSCOWITZ, BARRY A

FOZOUNI, FARSHEED

DONOHUE, TODD

Defendant Attorney

BERNSTEIN, CRAIG

 

Court Documents

191st COVER SHEET

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st COVER SHEET

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY

ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY

ORDER - PRETRIAL

ORDER - PRETRIAL

ORDER - LEAVE

ORDER - LEAVE; Comment: TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT

LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 001 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 001 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 003 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 003 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 004 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 004 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 002 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 002 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

RESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANT'S NO-EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLTS MTN FOR CONT OF HEARING

MOTION - CONTINUANCE; Comment: OF HEARING ON DEFS NO EVID MSJ

2ND AMENDED ZOOM - DEFENDANT'S NO-EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: - 2ND AMENDED ZOOM CONFERENCE - ON DEFENDANT'S NO-EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEF NO EVID MSJ

NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ISSUE CITATION - ISSUE CITATION - DUKE, INC. GENERAL CONTRACTORS

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: (SEE NOTE TAB)

ISSUE CITATION:DUKE, INC. GENERAL CONTRACTORS

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: (SEE NOTE TAB)

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION - DUKE, INC. GENERAL CONTRACTORS

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Summary Judgment; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: DF/NO EVID MSJ FILED07/29/21 1H CHANTAE 214-521-2814 (VIA ZOOM). P/M/CONT/HEARING - VALERIE 214 880 2681.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - LEAVE; Comment: TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 001 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 003 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 004 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS - SEGMENT 002 OF EXHIBIT 10 TO PLTS RSP TO NO EVID MSJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S NO-EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 32396-2021-DCLK; TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 32007-2021-DCLK; TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: TRANSFORM SR HOLDING MANAGEMENT LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $342.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $342.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: (SEE NOTE TAB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUKE & CO, LLC doing business as DYNAMIC CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSFORM SR HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bernstein