This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/16/2022 at 02:27:29 (UTC).

TRACEY MELLENTHIN, et al vs. PINNACLE PROPANE EXPRESS, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 TRACEY MELLENTHIN filed an Other lawsuit against PINNACLE PROPANE EXPRESS, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2697

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELLENTHIN, TRACEY

MELLENTHIN, CLIFFORD

Defendants

PARKER GAS COMPANY, INCORPORATED

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

PINNACLE PROPANE EXPRESS, LLC

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

RAPIDXCHANGE

BROOKSHIRE GROCERY COMPANY

1600 W.S.W. Loop 323

Tyler, TX 75710

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNOLD, JOHN W

Defendant Attorneys

DYER, MARK J

MOORE, ALAN POWERS

LASKEY, H. BROOK

WICKERN, ALYSSA P.

PEAVLER, DONNA C

SUDDAY, SARA KIMBROUGH

BLAKEY, DELANEY

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PROTECT

ORDER - PROTECT; Comment: STIPULATED

PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER

JOINT MOTION TO PROTECT

MOTION - PROTECT; Comment: JOINT

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - BROOKSHIRE GROCERY COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - BROOKSHIRE GROCERY COMPANY

ORIGINAL ANSWER - BROOSHIRE GROCERY COMPANY

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ISSUE CITATION - PINNACLE PROPANE EXPRESS, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - PARKER GAS COMPANY, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - BROOKSHIRE GROCERY COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PROTECT; Comment: STIPULATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - PROTECT; Comment: JOINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - BROOKSHIRE GROCERY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - PINNACLE PROPANE EXPRESS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - PARKER GAS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PINNACLE PROPANE EXPRESS, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 22691-2022-DCLK; PINNACLE PROPANE EXPRESS, LLC $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/25/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 04/20/2022: Comment; PARKER GAS COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 04/21/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 05/11/2022: Comment; BROOKSHIRE GROCERY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MELLENTHIN, TRACEY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MELLENTHIN, TRACEY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 14802-2022-DCLK; MELLENTHIN, TRACEY $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MELLENTHIN, TRACEY : Transaction Assessment; ; $384.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: MELLENTHIN, TRACEY ; Total Financial Assessment $384.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $384.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brookshire Grocery Company doing business as Super 1 Foods is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARNOLD, JOHN W