This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/04/2022 at 03:35:23 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF DANIEL THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 GUARDIANSHIP OF DANIEL THOMPSON was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, MARGARET JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********06-3

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, MARGARET JONES

 

Party Details

Applicants

THOMPSON, TERRY G.

Garland, TX 75043

THOMPSON, TARA PROWELL

Garland, TX 75043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr.

 

Court Documents

THOMPSON.APP.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANS OF THE PERSON

THOMPSON.WAIVER.JOSHUA.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - JOSHUA

THOMPSON.WAIVER.COURNEY.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING -COURTNEY

ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

MISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

Posted Notice - Application for Letters of Guardianship

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/25/22

Citation in Probate - Guardianship

ISSUE CITATION

RETURN PERSONAL CITATION

RETURN PERSONAL CITATION

JBCC.TERRY.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - TERRY THOMPSON

JBCC.TARA.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - TARA PROWELL- THOMPSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - TARA PROWELL- THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - TERRY THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN PERSONAL CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Served: 07/19/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 2; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 2; Returned: 07/20/2022; Comment: RTN:07/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 07/11/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 07/12/2022; Comment: RTN:07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/25/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2022-10895; O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. ; Total Financial Assessment $25.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for THOMPSON, TERRY G. : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for THOMPSON, TERRY G. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-10614; THOMPSON, TERRY G. $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for THOMPSON, TERRY G. : Transaction Assessment; ; $482.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: THOMPSON, TERRY G. ; Total Financial Assessment $482.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $482.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING -COURTNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - JOSHUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMEDICAL REPORT OR LETTER; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MEDICAL EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANS OF THE PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard D. O'Connor