This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 01:24:21 (UTC).

THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY vs. ANGELICA ANDRADE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANGELICA ANDRADE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA and PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0211

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA

PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY

24165 Ih-10 West Suite 217-418, San

Antonio, TX 78257

Defendant

ANDRADE, ANGELICA

Prairie, TX 75052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOACK, CAROLYN J

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION-ANGELICA ANDRADE

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - ANGELICA ANDRADE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - ANGELICA ANDRADE

dism letter (116th)

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

MOTION RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN

PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

DISM NOTICE FINAL

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET

ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: M/ORDER TO RETAIN SUBMITTED TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - ANGELICA ANDRADE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/26/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/27/2023: Comment; ANGELICA ANDRADE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 1120-2023-DCLK; THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: REQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less