This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/19/2022 at 06:44:27 (UTC).

TEXAS PARK MANOR, L.P. vs. DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 TEXAS PARK MANOR, L P filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6786

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEXAS PARK MANOR, L.P.

Defendant

DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

2949 North Stemmons Freeway

Dallas, TX 75247-6195

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DUNCAN, RICK L.

DUNCAN, RICK

Defendant Attorney

METCALF, BRADEN W.

 

Court Documents

ISSUE CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

ISSUE CITATION

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT MAILED

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT MAILED

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

PROPOSED ORDER OF AGREED JUDGMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER OF AGREED JUDGMENT

ORDER OF AGREED JUDGMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Judgment Type; AGREED JUDGMENT; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; TEXAS PARK MANOR, L.P.; Awarded Against:; DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

ISSUE CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

ISSUE CITATION

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 04/06/22 AGREED JUDGMENT (signed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Judgment Type: AGREED JUDGMENT; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; TEXAS PARK MANOR, L.P.: Awarded Against:; DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER OF AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 12/01/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 12/06/2021: Comment; DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TEXAS PARK MANOR, L.P. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 77179-2021-DCLK; TEXAS PARK MANOR, L.P. $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TEXAS PARK MANOR, L.P. : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: TEXAS PARK MANOR, L.P. ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer METCALF, BRADEN W.