This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/17/2022 at 00:51:09 (UTC).

TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC vs. LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, RISK PLACEMENT SERVICES-DALLAS, ANCHORA INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, RISK PLACEMENT SERVICES-DALLAS, ANCHORA INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BENSON, D'METRIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********51-A

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BENSON, D'METRIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendants

LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

945 East Paces Ferry Road, Suite 1800, Texas Commission

Atlanta, GA 30326

RISK PLACEMENT SERVICES-DALLAS

5001 Spring Valley, Suite 255W

Dallas, TX 75244

ANCHORA INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC

1204 E. Washington Street

Greenville, SC 29601

MCLARENS, INC.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

PIKE, RYAN

Dallas, TX 75244

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON (FARADAY SYNDICATE 435)

750 7Th Ave., New

York, NY 10019

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON (BEASLEY LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 2623 AND SYNDICATE 623)

280 Park Avenue East Tower, 25Th Floor, New

York, NY 10017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKELS, JOSEPH E, Sr.

Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY, ALICIA A.

JONES, PAIGE C

AYERS, DEANNE C

RYMER, NATHAN

 

Court Documents

1CCL JURY TRIAL/MED

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

1CCL JURY TRIAL/MED

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

1CCL JURY TRIAL/MED

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

1CCL JURY TRIAL/MED

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

1CCL JURY TRIAL/MED

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

1CCL JURY TRIAL/MED

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

2 CCL#1 CLERKS COURT CALL

MOTION - DISMISS; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

2 CCL#1 CLERKS COURT CALL

MOTION - DISMISS; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

2 CCL#1 CLERKS COURT CALL

MOTION - DISMISS; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

JURY FEE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: JURY FEE

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 59289992

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 59289992

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 59289992

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 59289992

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 59289992

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 59289992

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 59289992

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

190 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Comment: DEFT'S (pltf filing obj to VJ Akin?)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: DEFENDANT MCLARENS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO TEXAS INSURANCE CODE 542A.006(C)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MCLARENS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DENYING; Comment: SPECIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORTER CERTIFICATE; Comment: REPORTERS CERTIFICATION ORAL DEPOSITION OF AARON SMITH AND ANCHORA INSURANCE SERVICES LLC JUNE 15, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF S SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANT S CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. CSXNWFQP0000165-00; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. W2D806200101: LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF PLEA IN ABATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER DENYING SPECIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2021-11941; TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2021-11878; TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: TEXAS GREEN STAR HOLDINGS, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $345.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: JURY FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 59289992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANCHORA INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MCLARENS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Risk Placement Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER B1180D190825/1197JK is a litigant