This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/07/2022 at 03:25:22 (UTC).

TERRY ARMSTRONG, et al vs. ARKEMA, INC. , et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 TERRY ARMSTRONG filed an Other lawsuit against ARKEMA, INC . This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is HOFFMAN, MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5538

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARMSTRONG, TERRY

ARMSTRONG, KATHERINE

Defendants

ARKEMA, INC.

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

DCO LLC

4701 Cox Rd Ste 285, Glen

Allen, VA 23060

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

GSK CONSUMER HEALTH, INC.

251 Little Falls Dr

Wilmington, DE 19808

HIMMEL MANAGEMENT CO. LLC

C/O Violetas, Coral

Gables, FL 33134

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION LLC

106 Colony Park Dr Ste 800-B

Cumming, GA 30040

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

SERV-PAR COMPANY, INC.

327 W Crawford

Denison, TX 75020

PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-BYMERGER TO WALLACE & TIERNAN D/B/A WTS PHARMACRAFT) FOR ITS DESENEX LINE OF PRODUCTS

COTY, INC.

251 Little Falls Dr

Wilmington, DE 19808

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC

MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS INC

CHATTEM, INC.

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

65 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, HOLLY C

Defendant Attorneys

OGDEN, TODD

HIGGINS, SEAN M

Other Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D

LOWERY, JAMES III

YARBROUGH, THEODORE C.

COX, MARYALYCE W

 

Court Documents

SPECIAL APPEARANCE - BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLC

SPECIAL APPEARANCE; Comment: BRENTAG SPECIALTIES LLC'S

SPECIAL APPEARANCE - BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

SPECIAL APPEARANCE; Comment: BRENTAG NORTH AMERICA INC

ORIGINAL ANSWER/ SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

CROSS CLAIM/ ORIGINAL ANSWER/ MOTION TO TRANSFER/ SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS

COUNTER CLAIM

ISSUE CITATION- 10. FORD MOTOR COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 9. CHATTEM, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 8. BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 7. BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION- 6. BLOCK DRUG COMPANY, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 5. BASF CATALYSTS LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 4. BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 3. AVON PRODUCTS, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 2. AVCO CORPORATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION- 1. ARKEMA, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

FP FILE DESK JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

CCIS

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPECIAL APPEARANCE; Comment: BRENTAG SPECIALTIES LLC'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPECIAL APPEARANCE; Comment: BRENTAG NORTH AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. : STATE CREDIT; ; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 43561-2022-DCLK; MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPECIAL EXCEPTIONS; Comment: DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPECIAL EXCEPTIONS; Comment: DEFENDANT AVCO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
178 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARMSTRONG, TERRY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 32163-2022-DCLK; ARMSTRONG, TERRY $847.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARMSTRONG, TERRY : Transaction Assessment; ; $984.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ARMSTRONG, TERRY ; Total Financial Assessment $984.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $984.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT GLOBAL A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC (F/K/A MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant