This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/05/2022 at 15:30:25 (UTC).

STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC et al vs. CITY OF DALLAS et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CITY OF DALLAS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA and PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2839

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA

PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS

Dallas, TX 75219

STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

GILBERT, ANDREW

Dallas, TX 75201

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALTICK, MATTHEW J.

CLARK, STEVEN EUGENE

Defendant Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ, STACY JORDAN

FONES, KATHLEEN M.

 

Court Documents

APPELLATE RECORD

APPELLATE RECORD; Comment: 05-21-00840-CV CLERK'S RECORD SUBMITTED TO 5TH COA WITH TRACE #46129

COA - NO PAYMENT LETTER

COA - NO PAYMENT LETTER; Comment: CONFIRMATION #45976

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER; Comment: RE: ORDER

5TH COA ORDER

5TH COA ORDER; Comment: RE: CLERKS RECORD

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING CITY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR APPENDIX

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING CITY OF DALLAS'S MOTIONFORLEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FORAPPENDIX TO MOTION TO DECLARE ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS AVEXATIOUS LITIGANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: SEVENTH

JUDGMENT - FINAL (ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS)

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type; JUDGMENT - FINAL (ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS); Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; CITY OF DALLAS, et al; Awarded Against:; STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC, et al

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING CITY'S MOTION TO DECLARE ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING CITY OF DALLAS'S MOTION TO DECLARE ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS AVEXATIOUS LITIGANT

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER; Comment: 05-21-00840-CV

COA - POST CARD

COA - POST CARD; Comment: 05-21-00840-CV

SUPPLEMENTAL APPELLATE RECORD

APPELLATE RECORD; Comment: SUPLEMENTAL 05-21-00840-CV CLERKS RECORD 1 SUBMIT 5TH COA WITH CONFIRMATION # 47165

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST

SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST

COA - POST CARD

COA - POST CARD; Comment: 05-21-00840-CV

APPELLATE RECORD

APPELLATE RECORD; Comment: 05-21-00840-CV CLERK'S RECORD SUBMITTED TO 5TH COA WITH TRACE #46129

COA - NO PAYMENT LETTER

COA - NO PAYMENT LETTER; Comment: CONFIRMATION #45976

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER; Comment: RE: ORDER

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER; Comment: 05-21-00840-CV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 10209-2022-DCLK; LESLIE WIM ADAMS AND ASSOCIATES $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOA - POST CARD; Comment: 05-21-00840-CV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLATE RECORD; Comment: SUPLEMENTAL 05-21-00840-CV CLERKS RECORD 1 SUBMIT 5TH COA WITH CONFIRMATION # 47165

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE; Comment: EMAILED ATTY LESLIE WM. ADAMS $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: PREPARING CLERKS SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOA - POST CARD; Comment: 05-21-00840-CV

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/11/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CONSTABLE 1: Returned; 03/16/2021: Comment; CITY OF DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 13468-2021-DCLK; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS $88.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS : Transaction Assessment; ; $88.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS ; Total Financial Assessment $203.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $203.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 13467-2021-DCLK; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $810.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $810.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAMATINA HOLDING LLC is a litigant