This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 14:06:13 (UTC).

STACY ELAM vs. SILVER CREEK II NORSTAR CORP, et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 STACY ELAM filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SILVER CREEK II NORSTAR CORP. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0999

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELAM, STACY

Defendants

SILVER CREEK II NORSTAR CORP

1201 Elm Street 5400 Renaissance Tower

Dallas, TX 75270

SILVER CREEK II NORTSTAR USA LLC

1201 El Street 5400 Renaissance Tower

Dallas, TX 75270

NORTSTAR DEVELOPMENT USA LP

1201 Elm Street 5400 Renaissance Tower

Dallas, TX 75270

NORSTAR ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

1201 Elm Street 5400 Renaissance Tower

Dallas, TX 75270

RICHMOND & ASSOCIATES LANDSCAPING LTD

1410 Westway Circle

Carrollton, TX 75006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POPE, BRYAN D

Defendant Attorneys

SHIPPEE, CHRISTIAN P

HARDIN, BARRY L

 

Court Documents

191st COVER SHEET

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st COVER SHEET

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

ORDER - PRETRIAL

ORDER - PRETRIAL

DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

LETTER REGARDING REMOVAL FOR DISMISSAL DOCKET

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REGARDING REMOVAL FOR DISMISSAL DOCKET

EXECUTED CITATION:SILVER CREEK II NORSTAR CORP

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION:SILVER CREEK II NORSTAR CORP

EXECUTED CITATION:NORSTAR DEVELOPMENT USA, L.P.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION:NORSTAR DEVELOPMENT USA, L.P.

EXECUTED CITATION:NORSTAR ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION:NORSTAR ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

191FINAL DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

PLTS CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S

MAILED ORDER

MAILED ORDER

MAILED ORDER

MAILED ORDER

191st COVER SHEET

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st COVER SHEET

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

PLTS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

EXECUTED CITATION - RICHMOND & ASSOCIATES LANDSCAPING LTD

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RICHMOND & ASSOCIATES LANDSCAPING LTD

191FINAL DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RICHMOND & ASSOCIATES LANDSCAPING LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/03/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/05/2022: Comment; RICHMOND & ASSOCIATES LANDSCAPING LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ELAM, STACY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 82125-2021-DCLK; ELAM, STACY $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ELAM, STACY : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/08/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 09/09/2021: Comment; NORSTAR ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/08/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 09/09/2021: Comment; SILVER CREEK II NORSTAR CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/08/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 09/09/2021: Comment; SILVER CREEK II NORTSTAR USA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ELAM, STACY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 53629-2021-DCLK; ELAM, STACY $364.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ELAM, STACY : Transaction Assessment; ; $364.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: ELAM, STACY ; Total Financial Assessment $372.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $372.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORSTAR ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIPPEE, CHRISTIAN P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRY L HARDIN