This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/15/2022 at 19:03:35 (UTC).

S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC vs. SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 S S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC filed an Other lawsuit against SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TILLERY, DALE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2918

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TILLERY, DALE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC

2110 Birdcreek Dr, N/A

Temple, TX 76502

S&S Concrete Contractors, Inc.

2110 Birdcreek Dr, N/A

Temple, TX 76502

Defendants

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

2103 Citywest Blvd Ste 1300

Houston, TX 77042-2832

CORTLAND IMPROVEMENTS, LLC

211 E 7Th Street Ste620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COWAN, CALVIN

Defendant Attorney

WARD, CHRISTOPHER R

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION- SURETTEC INSURANCE

ISSUE CITATION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

First Amended Original Petition

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: First Amended Original Petition

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION- Cortland Improvements, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: Cortland Improvements, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 27367-2022-DCLK; S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIRST AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/29/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 03/29/2022: Comment; SURETTEC INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 17238-2022-DCLK; S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 16351-2022-DCLK; S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: S&S CONCRETE CONTRACTORS INC ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cortland Improvements, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD, CHRISTOPHER R