This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/18/2022 at 01:34:38 (UTC).

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY vs. JASON ALMANZA PANIAGUA

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JASON ALMANZA PANIAGUA. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0305

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY

308 S.Akard Street Room 1910.03

Dallas, TX 75202

AT&T TEXAS

Defendant

PANIAGUA, JASON ALMANZA

Dallas, TX 75235

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELA, RAY L

 

Court Documents

ISSUE CITATION - JASON ALMANZA PANIAGUA

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - JASON ALMANZA PANIAGUA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JASON ALMANZA PANIAGUA

191FINAL DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type; DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY; Awarded Against:; PANIAGUA, JASON ALMANZA

FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a)

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a)

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY: Awarded Against:; PANIAGUA, JASON ALMANZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JASON ALMANZA PANIAGUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/10/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 02/14/2022: Comment; JASON ALMANZA PANIAGUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 1568-2022-DCLK; SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY D/B/A AT&T TEXAS $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southwestern Bell Telephone Company is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant