This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 02/07/2023 at 21:58:59 (UTC).

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY vs. BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0319

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY

AT&T TEXAS

Defendants

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

GD CONSTRUCTION, INC.

SPECTRUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELA, RAY L

Defendant Attorneys

STORK, BRIAN M

JUDIS, BRIAN J

APPLE, J DAVID

 

Court Documents

ISSUE CITATION-GD CONSTRUCTION, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

MAILED ORDER NONSUIT TO BRIAN JUDIS

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

MAILED ORDER NONSUIT TO BRIAN STORK

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

MAILED ORDER NONSUIT TO RAY VELA

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

MAILED ORDER NONSUIT TO GD CONSTRUCTION INC

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

ORDER FOR NONSUIT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY; Awarded Against:; BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC., et al

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Comment: BRIAN J JUDIS NEW COUNSEL

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

DEF/ MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER: Comment; DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC. D/B/A SPECTRUM'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

EXECUTED CITATION - CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC DBA SPECTRUM

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC DBA SPECTRUM

EXECUTED CITATION - BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC

ISSUE CITATION-BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY: Awarded Against:; BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC., et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Comment: BRIAN J JUDIS NEW COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER: Comment; DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC. D/B/A SPECTRUM'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 1818-2022-DCLK; SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY D/B/A AT&T TEXAS $237.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $374.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPLHONE COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $374.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $374.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: GD CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/21/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 01/28/2022: Comment; CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/26/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 01/28/2022: Comment; BRIDGEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less