This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/05/2022 at 20:10:52 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF JUAN SOSA

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 GUARDIANSHIP OF JUAN SOSA was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********38-1

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Applicant

SOSA, JUAN FRANCISCO

Dallas, TX 75211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr.

 

Court Documents

SOSA.APP.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON

SOSA.WAIVER.ALEXIS.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - ALEXIS

SOSA.WAIVER.OSBALDO.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - OSBALDO

ORDER.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

JBCC.SOSA.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE-JUAN SOSA

Posted Notice - Application for Letters of Guardianship

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/25/22

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN PERSONAL CITATION

RETURN UNEXECUTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Return Unserved: 08/03/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 5; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 5; Returned: 08/03/2022; Comment: rtn: 8/3/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 07/18/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 07/19/2022; Comment: RTN: 7/19/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/25/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE-JUAN SOSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2022-11880; O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : Transaction Assessment; ; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. ; Total Financial Assessment $25.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SOSA, JUAN FRANCISCO : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SOSA, JUAN FRANCISCO : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-11162; SOSA, JUAN FRANCISCO $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SOSA, JUAN FRANCISCO : Transaction Assessment; ; $482.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SOSA, JUAN FRANCISCO ; Total Financial Assessment $482.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $482.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - OSBALDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - ALEXIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketMEDICAL REPORT OR LETTER; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MEDICAL EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard D. O'Connor