This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 02:30:20 (UTC).

IN RE: MARINE PETROLEUM TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 IN RE MARINE PETROLEUM TRUST was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5993

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS BANK

Defendant

MARINE PETROLEUM TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYNES, CRAIG A

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY TRUST AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: TO MODIFY TRUST AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR

LETTER TO JUDGE REGARDING EXHIBITS

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER TO JUDGE REGARDING EXHIBITS

HEARING-VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: VIA ZOOM

PROPOSE AMENDED ORDER

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AMENDED ORDER MODIFYING TRUST INDENTURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: REQUEST VIA ZOOM ** SET BY RACHEL 214-969-1236

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: CONFERENCE CALL * SET BY RACHEL 214-969-1236

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY JUDGE; Comment: 30 MINS SET BY RACHELLE 214-969-1236 VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AMENDED ORDER MODIFYING TRUST INDENTURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER TO JUDGE REGARDING EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: TO MODIFY TRUST AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 34370-2022-DCLK; SIMMONS BANK $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SIMMONS BANK ; Total Financial Assessment $350.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Simmons Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYNES, CRAIG A.