This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/07/2022 at 20:48:33 (UTC).

SIMMONS BANK vs. MINH HOANG PHAM

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 SIMMONS BANK filed an Other lawsuit against MINH HOANG PHAM. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4423

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS BANK

Defendant

PHAM, MINH HOANG

Garland, TX 75040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, JONATHAN C

 

Court Documents

LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - TO FILE; LETTER

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION- MINH HUANG PHAM- VOID MISSING FEE STAMP

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION- MINH HUANG PHAM

ISSUE CITATION

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type; DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; SIMMONS BANK; Awarded Against:; PHAM, MINH HOANG

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - MINH HOANG PHAM

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - MINH HOANG PHAM

PLTF/MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SERVICE MEMBERS DECLARATION

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: SERVICE MEMBERS DECLARATION

CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS (DEF)

CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

PROPOSED FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a)

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AND TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a)

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AND TO DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; SIMMONS BANK: Awarded Against:; PHAM, MINH HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AND TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: submission - Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: SERVICE MEMBERS DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - MINH HOANG PHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 05/19/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 05/27/2022: Comment; MINH HUANG PHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 25849-2022-DCLK; SIMMONS BANK $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SIMMONS BANK ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - TO FILE; LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Simmons Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Chance Smith